Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240006565 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21171710 | 30.04.2021 | WO2022EP61367 | 28.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117677670 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21171710 | 30.04.2021 | WO2022EP61367 | 28.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4330329 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21171710 | 30.04.2021 | WO2022EP61367 | 28.04.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022229335 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21171710 | 30.04.2021 |