blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4346882

EP4346882 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION COMPRISING AN ANTI-CD205 ANTIBODY AND AN IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.06.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2024Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2024  [2024/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxford BioTherapeutics Ltd
Suite A, Second Floor The Schrodinger Building
Heatley Road
Oxford Science Park
Oxford
OX4 4GE / GB
[2024/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ROHLFF, Christian
Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB
 [2024/15]
Application number, filing date22726279.719.05.2022
[2024/15]
WO2022GB51256
Priority number, dateGB2021000751826.05.2021         Original published format: GB 202107518
GB2021000838711.06.2021         Original published format: GB 202108387
GB2021000927128.06.2021         Original published format: GB 202109271
[2024/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022248835
Date:01.12.2022
Language:EN
[2022/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4346882
Date:10.04.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/00, A61K47/68, A61P35/00, C07K16/28, A61P43/00, A61K39/395
[2024/15]
CPC:
C07K16/2851 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K39/00 (EP,IL,US); A61K39/395 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (KR); A61K47/68031 (US); A61K47/68033 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/68037 (US); A61K47/6829 (US); A61K47/6831 (US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,IL,KR); A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61P37/04 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL); C07K16/2809 (US); C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR); A61K2039/505 (KR); A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR); C07K2317/31 (US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/15]
Extension statesBA12.12.2023
ME12.12.2023
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATION MIT EINEM ANTI-CD205-ANTIKÖRPER UND EINEM IMMUN-CHECKPOINT-INHIBITOR[2024/15]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION COMPRISING AN ANTI-CD205 ANTIBODY AND AN IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR[2024/15]
French:COMBINAISON PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN ANTICORPS ANTI-CD205 ET UN INHIBITEUR DE POINT DE CONTRÔLE IMMUNITAIRE[2024/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2023National basic fee paid 
12.12.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2023Examination requested  [2024/15]
12.12.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.06.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2009061996  (CELLDEX THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al);
 [XDY]WO2015052537  (OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]);
 [XY]WO2018162727  (BERLIN CHEMIE AG [DE]);
 [Y]US2019023790  (GIURLEO JASON T [US], et al);
 [XY]WO2019238843  (BERLIN CHEMIE AG [DE]);
 [Y]US2020283536  (CHARATI MANOJ BABURAO [US], et al);
by applicantUS4439196
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4475196
 US4486194
 US4487603
 US4522811
 US4596556
 US4790824
 US4941880
 US5064413
 US5312335
 WO9413804
 US5374548
 US5383851
 US5399163
 US5399331
 US5416016
 US6214345
 WO02083180
 WO03011161
 WO2004010957
 EP1391213
 WO2004026293
 WO2004043493
 US2005238649
 WO2005112919
 US2006024317
 US2006074008
 WO2006110476
 WO2007018431
 WO2007059404
 WO2007089149
 WO2008104806
 WO2009017394
 US7521541
 WO2009061996
 WO2010062171
 WO2015052537
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.