EP4329714 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A ZINC SALT AND AN ADDITIONAL EFFECTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cosphatec GmbH Hopfenmarkt 33 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUNS, Frank 20249 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
DIETZ, Carsten 67434 Neustadt an der Weinstrasse / DE | 03 /
SCHRÖDER, Markus 22045 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
SCHOLZ, Jonas 20459 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
WIENTAPPER, Johanna 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22726651.7 | 29.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022EP61556 | Priority number, date | EP20210171696 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21171696 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022229423 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329714 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/27, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/40, A61Q19/00, A61Q17/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K31/047 (EP);
A61K31/16 (EP);
A61K31/22 (EP);
A61K33/30 (EP);
A61K36/575 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K8/34 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/347 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/40 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0063 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/107 (EP);
A61K9/12 (EP);
A61K9/122 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/22, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM ZINKSALZ UND EINEM ZUSÄTZLICHEN WIRKSTOFF | [2024/10] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING A ZINC SALT AND AN ADDITIONAL EFFECTIVE INGREDIENT | [2024/10] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN SEL DE ZINC ET UN INGRÉDIENT ADDITIONNEL EFFICACE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 23.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007190177 (KLING WILLIAM O [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0028]; claims 1-20 *; | [X]FR2968942 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-15,17 * page 1 - page 4; example all; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]CN105025712 (SYMRISE AG) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2016100574 (PESARO MANUEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0204] - paragraph [0252] * * paragraph [0380] - paragraph [0397]; tables V, VI, XXXII, LX *; | [X]WO2018068825 (SYMRISE AG [DE]) [X] 1-17 * page 1, paragraph 41 - paragraph 52 * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0106] *; | [Y]KR20190069836 (CROPASSE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-17* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007076125 |