EP4351688 - INTERMITTENT CATHETERS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. R. Bard, Inc. 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIDDIQUI, Shahab Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22727709.2 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022US29431 | Priority number, date | US202163209832P | 11.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163209832 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260831 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351688 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M27/00, A61L29/08 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61M25/0045 (EP);
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
A61L29/08 (EP,US);
A61M25/007 (EP);
A61M25/0111 (EP);
A61M27/00 (EP);
A61L2400/10 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0046 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1092 (US);
A61M2210/1096 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | INTERMITTIERENDE KATHETER UND VERFAHREN | [2024/16] | English: | INTERMITTENT CATHETERS AND METHODS | [2024/16] | French: | CATHÉTERS INTERMITTENTS ET PROCÉDÉS | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9311821 (ROCHESTER MEDICAL CORP [US]); | [XYI]WO9314806 (ROCHESTER MEDICAL CORP [US]); | [XYI]US5417666 (COULTER PRINCE J [US]); | [IY]WO2018219433 (SUSOS AG [CH]) |