EP4329853 - URINARY CATHETER-INSERTION KITS WITH INTEGRATED INSTRUCTIONS FOR USE AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. R. Bard, Inc. 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Brian Covington, GA 30014 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22728721.6 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022US29394 | Priority number, date | US202163193440P | 26.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163193440 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022250994 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329853 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61B50/30, A61B50/33 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61M25/002 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP);
A61M25/0017 (US);
A61B2050/3006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | HARNKATHETEREINFÜHRUNGSKITS MIT INTEGRIERTEN INSTRUKTIONEN ZUR VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/10] | English: | URINARY CATHETER-INSERTION KITS WITH INTEGRATED INSTRUCTIONS FOR USE AND METHODS THEREOF | [2024/10] | French: | KITS D'INSERTION DE CATHÉTER URINAIRE À MODE D'EMPLOI INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2339724 (GERCKE KAUPERT WOLF BUEDIGER D); | [A]US2006009742 (SOLAZZO ANTHONY [US]); | [A]WO2019209867 (BARD INC C R [US]); | [Y]WO2019246307 (BARD INC C R [US]) | by applicant | US2016228676 | US2017216558 |