|
16.04.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2025 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2025 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2025 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Description |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2025 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.11.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.10.2024 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2024 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2024 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.09.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2023 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
142 |
|
12.12.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
142 |
|
12.12.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
12.12.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
177 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
24.11.2022 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
151 |
|
26.08.2022 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
26.08.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.08.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.08.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
79 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
62 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |