EP4334308 - LACTONE AND LACTAM CONTAINING COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS IMMUNOMODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tao Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhongxing Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 03 /
YIN, Zhiwei Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22728999.8 | 04.05.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022US27615 | Priority number, date | US202163184240P | 05.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163184240 P | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022235754 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334308 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D403/14, C07D407/12, C07D407/14, A61K31/44, A61K31/445, A61P35/00, C07D413/14 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D405/14 (KR);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/02 (KR);
C07D401/12 (KR);
C07D401/14 (KR);
C07D403/14 (EP);
C07D405/12 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | LACTON UND LACTAM ENTHALTENDE VERBINDUNGEN ALS IMMUNOMODULATOREN | [2024/11] | English: | LACTONE AND LACTAM CONTAINING COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS IMMUNOMODULATORS | [2024/11] | French: | COMPOSÉS CONTENANT DE LA LACTONE ET DU LACTAME UTILES EN TANT QU'IMMUNOMODULATEURS | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015034820 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1-12* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2020047035 (CHEMOCENTRYX INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP3658522 (CHEMOCENTRYX INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | US5811097 | US5837243 | US5922845 | - KEIR MEBUTTE MJFREEMAN GJ et al., Annu. Rev. Immunol., (20080000), page 26 | - BUTTE MJ et al., Immunity, (20070000), vol. 27, pages 111 - 122 | - PATERSON AM et al., J Immunol., (20110000), vol. 187, pages 1097 - 1105 | - YANG J. et al., J Immunol., (20110801), vol. 187, no. 3, pages 1113 - 9 | - DONG HCHEN L, JMolMed, (20030000), vol. 81, no. 5, pages 281 - 287 | - DONG HSTROME SESALAMOA DR et al., Nat Med., (20020000), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 793 - 800 | - BARBER DLWHERRY EJMASOPUST D et al., Nature, (20060000), vol. 439, no. 7077, pages 682 - 687 | - S. J. HAS. N. MUELLERE. J. WHERRY et al., The Journal of Experimental Medicine, (20080000), vol. 205, no. 3, pages 543 - 555 | - A. C. FINNEFROCKA. TANGF. LI et al., The Journal of Immunology, (20090000), vol. 182, no. 2, pages 980 - 987 | - M. -Y. SONGS. -H. PARKH. J. NAMD. -H. CHOIY.-C. SUNG, The Journal of Immunotherapy, (20110000), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 297 - 306 | - HAHNE, M., Science, (19960000), vol. 274, pages 1363 - 1365 | - A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, Harwood Academic Publishers, (19910000), pages 113 - 191 | - IWAI, Int. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 17, pages 133 - 144 | - HE et al., J. Immunol., (20040000), vol. 173, pages 4919 - 28 | - ROSENBERG, S., "Development of Cancer Vaccines", ASCO Educational Book Spring, (20000000), pages 60 - 62 | - LOGOTHETIS, C., ASCO Educational Book Spring, (20000000), pages 730 - 738 | - TAMURA, Y. et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 278, pages 3023 - 3043 | - DRANOFF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19930000), vol. 90, pages 3539 - 43 | - ROSENBERG, S A, Immunity, (19990000), vol. 10, pages 281 - 7 | - KIM, N et al., Science, (19940000), vol. 266, pages 2011 - 2013 | - SUOT, RSRIVASTAVA, P, Science, (19950000), vol. 269, pages 1585 - 1588 | - NESTLE, F. et al., Nature Medicine, (19980000), vol. 4, pages 328 - 332 | - KUGLER, A. et al., Nature Medicine, (20000000), vol. 6, pages 332 - 336 | - MOKYR, M. et al., Cancer Research, (19980000), vol. 58, pages 5301 - 5304 | - KEHRL, J. et al., J. Exp. Med., (19860000), vol. 163, pages 1037 - 1050 | - HOWARD, M.O'GARRA, A., Immunology Today, (19920000), vol. 13, pages 198 - 200 | - RIDGE, J. et al., Nature, (19980000), vol. 393, pages 474 - 478 | - ITO, N. et al., Immunobiology, (20000000), vol. 201, no. 5, pages 527 - 40 | - WEINBERG, A., Immunol, (20000000), vol. 164, pages 2160 - 2169 | - MELERO, I. et al., Nature Medicine, (19970000), vol. 3, pages 682 - 685 | - HUTLOFF, A. et al., Nature, (19990000), vol. 400, pages 173 - 177 | - HOLLIGER, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, Structure, (19940000), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - OVERWIJK, W. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19990000), vol. 96, pages 2982 - 2987 | - ROSENBERG, S AWHITE, D E, J. Immunother Emphasis Tumor Immunol, (19960000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 81 - 4 |