EP4341076 - A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Innovation & Technology S.L. Avenida de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSBOOM, Matthijs 8431HP Oosterwolde FR / NL | 02 /
DE LA FUENTE LARRAÑAGA, Marina 20303 Irun / ES | 03 /
HIERRO-OLABARRIA SALGADO, Francisco Javier 01400 Llodio / ES | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22729190.3 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022EP63146 | Priority number, date | EP20210382462 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21382462 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022243226 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341076 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/34, F03D1/06, B29K105/08, B29K105/10, B29K307/04, B29K309/08, B29L31/08 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
B29C66/1162 (EP,US);
B29C65/344 (EP,US);
B29C65/342 (EP);
B29C65/3468 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/14 (EP);
B29C66/524 (EP);
B29C66/54 (EP);
B29C66/612 (EP);
B29C66/636 (EP);
B29C66/721 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/73941 (EP);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
B29C65/3476 (EP);
B29C65/3492 (EP);
B29C65/4815 (EP);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/5057 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29C66/72141 (EP);
B29K2021/003 (US);
B29L2031/085 (EP,US);
F03D1/0677 (US);
F05B2230/232 (EP,US);
F05B2240/302 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES ROTORBLATTS EINER WINDTURBINE | [2024/13] | English: | A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND TURBINE | [2024/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE PALE DE ROTOR D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]GB2463250 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [XI]US10138867 (CARUSO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL [US], et al) |