EP4355277 - IMPROVED IRRIGATION IN A PHACOEMULSIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Surgical Vision, Inc. 31 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
AHARON, Eran 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
ALGAWI, Yehuda 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 04 /
SITNITSKY, Ilya 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22729795.9 | 24.05.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022IB54857 | Priority number, date | US202163210585P | 15.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163210585 P | US202217715091 | 07.04.2022 Original published format: US202217715091 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022263951 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355277 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61F9/00745 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SPÜLUNG IN EINEM PHAKOEMULSIFIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | IMPROVED IRRIGATION IN A PHACOEMULSIFICATION SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | IRRIGATION AMÉLIORÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE PHACOÉMULSIFICATION | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 12.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8903230 (COOPER CO INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 6 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 25 *; | [A]DE102007031722 (ZEISS CARL SURGICAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2014163455 (WILSON DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2020200313 (CHU MICHAEL S H [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] * |