Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024523746 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102021109591 | 16.04.2021 | WO2022DE100292 | 14.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4188666 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021109591 | 16.04.2021 | WO2022DE100292 | 14.04.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022218481 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A4 | WO2022218481 | 20.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021109591 | 16.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021109591 | 19.01.2023 | B4 | DE102021109591 | 20.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021109591 | 16.04.2021 |