EP4359906 - SCREEN SHARING SESSION PRIVACY MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITTAMPALLY, Vasanth Raja Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PATANKAR, Utkarsh Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22730653.7 | 23.05.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US30452 | Priority number, date | US202117357465 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: US202117357465 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022271368 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359906 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04L67/306 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/1454 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06F21/604 (US);
G06F21/629 (US);
G06F21/84 (US);
G09G5/00 (EP);
H04L67/025 (EP);
H04L67/14 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | SITZUNGSPRIVATSPHÄRENMANAGER ZUR GEMEINSAMEN BILDSCHIRMNUTZUNG | [2024/18] | English: | SCREEN SHARING SESSION PRIVACY MANAGER | [2024/18] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE DE CONFIDENTIALITÉ DE SESSION DE PARTAGE D'ÉCRAN | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006010392 (NOEL VICKI E [CA], et al); | [I]WO2009140766 (SMART TECHNOLOGIES ULC [CA], et al); | [XI]US2015032686 (KUCHOOR SANTHOSH KUMAR [IN]); | [I]US2019196774 (SARFI DAVID [HU], et al) |