EP4348137 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRE-COOLING A STREAM OF A TARGET FLUID TO A TEMPERATURE LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO 90 K [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGIE 1 Place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JALIA, Florian 92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
LINOTTE, Rémi 78450 Villepreux / FR | 03 /
FILALI, Hamza 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Cornuejols, Marine Sophie Cassiopi 230, avenue de l'Aube Rouge 34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22730920.0 | 31.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022EP64796 | Priority number, date | FR20210005723 | 31.05.2021 Original published format: FR 2105723 | [2024/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022253847 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4348137 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/00, F25J1/02 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
F25J1/001 (EP);
F25J1/0052 (EP,US);
F25J1/0007 (EP);
F25J1/005 (EP,US);
F25J1/0055 (EP);
F25J1/0062 (EP);
F25J1/0065 (EP);
F25J1/0067 (EP);
F25J1/0072 (EP,US);
F25J1/0077 (EP);
F25J1/0214 (EP);
F25J1/0215 (EP);
F25J1/0218 (EP);
F25J1/0221 (EP);
F25J1/0265 (EP);
F25J1/0291 (EP);
F25J3/0209 (US);
F25J2210/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORKÜHLUNG EINES ZIELFLUIDSTROMS AUF EINE TEMPERATUR UNTER ODER GLEICH 90 K | [2024/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRE-COOLING A STREAM OF A TARGET FLUID TO A TEMPERATURE LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO 90 K | [2024/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PRE-REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN FLUX D'UN FLUIDE CIBLE A UNE TEMPERATURE INFERIEURE OU EGALE A 90 K | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010083695 (KUNDIG ANDRES [CH]); | [XYI]US2018347897 (CARDELLA UMBERTO [DE], et al); | [Y]US2019063824 (WATANABE YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [XPYI]CN113446815 (HANGZHOU OXYGEN PLANT GROUP CO LTD); | by applicant | US2018347897 | US2019063824 |