EP4362722 - AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE WITH OVERHEATING PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATISTA, Rui Nuno Rodrigues Alves 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
SEREDA, Alexandra 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22730943.2 | 22.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022EP66956 | Priority number, date | EP20210182415 | 29.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21182415 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274798 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362722 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/44 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A24F40/44 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/48 (KR);
A24F7/00 (KR);
H05B3/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ÜBERHITZUNGSSCHUTZ | [2024/19] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE WITH OVERHEATING PREVENTION | [2024/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AVEC PRÉVENTION DE SURCHAUFFE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014060554 (COLLETT WILLIAM ROBERT [US], et al) |