EP4280886 - A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A CREAM CHEESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORO-SIERRA, José 82008 München / DE | 02 /
DANG, Christine Bich Phuong 82008 München / DE | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22730969.7 | 17.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022IB50339 | Priority number, date | GB20210000677 | 19.01.2021 Original published format: GB 202100677 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022157611 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4280886 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/045, A23C9/142, A23C19/076, A23C19/09 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A23C19/076 (EP,GB,US);
A23C19/045 (EP);
A23C19/0917 (EP,US);
A23C2210/00 (EP);
A23C2210/252 (EP);
A23C2210/254 (EP,US);
A23C9/1425 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RAHMKÄSE | [2023/48] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A CREAM CHEESE | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FROMAGE À LA CRÈME | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 06.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]EP1698231 (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [DE]) [XD] 1,2,9,13-15,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0021] , [0029] , [0035] * [I] 3-8,10-12,16,18; | [XDI]EP2649884 (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [US]) [XD] 1-5,7,8,15-17,19,20 * paragraphs [0060] , [0067] , [0127] - [0130]; figures 6,11,12; example 11 * [I] 6,9-14,18; | [AD]US2018249733 (RAJAKARI KIRSI [FI], et al) [AD] 1-20* paragraphs [0027] , [0035] , [0041]; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1698231 | EP2649884 | US2018024973 | US2018249733 |