EP4367763 - SYSTEM COMPRISING A CABLE AND A SEALING SLEEVE FOR THIS CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALENGHIEN, Olivier 93390 CLICHY SOUS BOIS / FR | 02 /
COTTARD, Christophe 92100 BOULOGNE BILLANCOURT / FR | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22731271.7 | 18.05.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022FR50945 | Priority number, date | FR20210007234 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107234 | [2024/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023281170 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367763 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/04, B60R16/02, F16J15/16, H01B7/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H02G15/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT EINEM KABEL UND EINER DICHTUNGSMUFFE FÜR DIESES KABEL | [2024/20] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING A CABLE AND A SEALING SLEEVE FOR THIS CABLE | [2024/20] | French: | SYSTEME COMPRENANT UN CABLE ET UN MANCHON D'ETANCHEITE POUR CE CABLE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB612213 (LUCAS LTD JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 47 - page 2, line 116 *; | [AD]FR2786033 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, line 8 - page 8, line 10 *; | [A]EP2042787 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]WO2017184443 (PONTUS SUBSEA CONNECTORS LLC [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * | by applicant | FR2107234 | FR2786033 |