EP4322840 - WEARABLE RING DEVICE AND METHOD OF MONITORING SLEEP APNEA EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APNIMED, INC. (DELAWARE) 39 John F. Kennedy Street, 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2024/16] |
Former [2024/08] | For all designated states APNIMED, INC. (DELAWARE) 20 Holyoke Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONIFICIO, William, D. Watervliet, NY 12189 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Lawrence, G. Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
MOLNAR, Dennis Hopkinton, NH 03229 / US | 04 /
WELLMAN, D., Andrew Wayland, MA 01778 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22731341.8 | 14.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022US24747 | Priority number, date | US202163175070P | 15.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163175070 P | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022221487 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322840 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/1455, A61B5/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/02416 (EP,KR);
A61B5/4818 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/14551 (US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,KR);
A61B5/4809 (KR);
A61B5/681 (EP,KR);
A61B5/6826 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE RINGVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON SCHLAFAPNOEEREIGNISSEN | [2024/08] | English: | WEARABLE RING DEVICE AND METHOD OF MONITORING SLEEP APNEA EVENTS | [2024/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANNULAIRE PORTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉVÉNEMENTS D'APNÉE DU SOMMEIL | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 13.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6608562 (KIMURA TEIYUU [JP], et al); | [A]US2010168531 (SHALTIS PHILLIP ANDREW [US], et al); | [XYI]US2018120892 (VON BADINSKI CURT C [US], et al); | [XYI]US10918289 (WASSON JACLYN LEVERETT [US], et al) |