EP4352195 - A TABLET COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURALIDHARAN, Girish 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 02 /
PATHAK, Gaurav 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 03 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Rajeesh, Kumar 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Reijns, Tiemen Geert Pieter Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22731589.2 | 01.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP64894 | Priority number, date | EP20210177953 | 07.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21177953 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022258453 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352195 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D3/37, C11D3/04, C11D3/10 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C11D17/0073 (EP);
C11D17/0091 (EP);
C11D17/044 (EP);
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/37 (EP);
C11D3/3788 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | TABLETTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/16] | English: | A TABLET COMPOSITION | [2024/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PASTILLE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB780355 (GUSTAF KORPOSOFF) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,8,9,12-15; | [A]WO9803064 (FMC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * examples 6-9 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 2 *; | [A]WO9855590 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * example - * * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 3, line 3 - line 11 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line l * * page 14, line 2 - page 16, line l *; | [A]EP1004661 (DALLI WERKE WAESCHE & KOERPERP [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * example - * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 29 * * page 5, paragraph 43 - page 6, paragraph 55 *; | [A]DE10002010 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * example - * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 8 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 24 *; | [A]WO2021013394 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 19, paragraph 5 - page 24, paragraph l * * page 25, paragraph 7 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 4 *; | [T] - "Hydrogels - Smart Materials for Biomedical Applications", doi:10.5772/intechopen.80536, ISBN 978-1-78985-876-1, (20190410), IntechOpen, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/intechopen.80536, XP055864879 [T] 1,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/intechopen.80536 | [T] - ENAS M. AHMED, "Hydrogel: Preparation, characterization, and applications", JOURNAL OF ADVANCED RESEARCH, (20130701), doi:10.1016/j.jare.2013.07.006, ISSN 2090-1232, XP055163462 [T] 1,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jare.2013.07.006 | by applicant | EP1642960 |