EP4346758 - STABLE LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH DRUG LOADINGS OF MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerecin Inc. 44 Cook Street, Suite 100-71 Denver, CO 80206 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Aikun Julie Denver, Colorado 80206 / US | 02 /
KAASGAARD, Thomas Denver, Colorado 80206 / US | 03 /
NAIR C K BALACHANDRAN, Murali Denver, Colorado 80206 / US | 04 /
HENDERSON, Samuel T. Denver, Colorado 80206 / US | 05 /
BOYD, Benjamin Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22731926.6 | 25.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US30819 | Priority number, date | US202163192826P | 25.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163192826 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022251288 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346758 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/107, A61K31/215, A61K31/23, A61P25/28 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,IL);
A61K9/107 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/1075 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/215 (EP,IL);
A61K31/23 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/12 (KR);
A61K47/14 (KR,US);
A61K47/24 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | STABILE FLÜSSIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HOHEM WIRKSTOFFGEHALT AN MITTELKETTIGEN TRIGLYCERIDEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | STABLE LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH DRUG LOADINGS OF MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2024/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LIQUIDES STABLES AYANT DES CHARGES MÉDICAMENTEUSES ÉLEVÉES DE TRIGLYCÉRIDES À CHAÎNE MOYENNE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9408610 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2020180980 (CERECIN INC [US]); |