EP4347576 - COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Hasselt Martelarenlaan 42 3500 Hasselt / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Maastricht Minderbroedersberg 4-6 6211 LK Maastricht / NL | For all designated states Academisch ziekenhuis Maastricht P. Debyelaan 25 6229 HX Maastricht / NL | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANMIERLO, Tim 3500 Hasselt / BE | 02 /
SCHEPERS, Melissa 3500 Hasselt / BE | 03 /
PICCART, Elisabeth 3500 Hasselt / BE | 04 /
PRICKAERTS, Jos 6229 ER Maastricht / NL | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22732100.7 | 02.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022EP65055 | Priority number, date | EP20210177320 | 02.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21177320 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022253959 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347576 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/08, A61K31/4155, A61P25/28, C07D261/08, C07D413/06 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C07D295/08 (EP);
C07D231/12 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61P25/08 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07C45/64 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2024/15] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS | [2024/15] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES TROUBLES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIFS | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2907806 (UNIV DEGLI STUDI GENOVA [IT], et al); |