EP4347700 - THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE, ELECTRICALLY INSULATING FILM AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Fanliang Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22732816.8 | 27.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US31242 | Priority number, date | CN202110584016 | 27.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110584016 | CN202210404208 | 18.04.2022 Original published format: CN202210404208 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022251566 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347700 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C09K5/08, H01B3/00, H01B3/30, H01M10/653 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01B3/006 (EP);
H01M10/653 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08K13/04 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K3/38 (EP);
C08K5/02 (EP);
C08L23/14 (EP);
C09K5/14 (EP,US);
H01B3/441 (EP);
H01M50/222 (EP);
H01M50/227 (EP);
H01M50/229 (EP);
H01M50/383 (US);
C08J2323/12 (US);
C08K2003/222 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,US);
C08K2003/385 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US);
C08K2201/012 (US);
C08K2201/014 (US);
C08K5/06 (US);
C08K7/00 (US);
C09K21/08 (EP);
C09K21/12 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L23/14 (EP);
C08K3/22, C08L23/14 (EP);
C08K3/38, C08L23/14 (EP);
C08K5/02, C08L23/14 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | WÄRMELEITENDE, ELEKTRISCH ISOLIERENDE FOLIE UND BATTERIEPACK DAMIT | [2024/15] | English: | THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE, ELECTRICALLY INSULATING FILM AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING SAME | [2024/15] | French: | FILM THERMIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR ET ÉLECTRIQUEMENT ISOLANT ET BLOC-BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3348618 (KANEKA CORP [JP]); | [IA]CN112455034 (SHENZHEN GOLDEN OCEAN IND DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) |