EP4320766 - MODULARIZED DESIGN FOR INTER-PHYSICAL LAYER PRIORITY UCI MULTIPLEXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Weidong San Diego, California 92131 / US | 02 /
GOHARI, Amir Aminzadeh Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
JIN, Chao San Diego, California 92131 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Dawei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
HE, Hong Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
OTERI, Oghenekome San Diego, California 92131 / US | 07 /
LIU, Ruoheng San Diego, California 92131 / US | 08 /
YE, Sigen San Diego, California 92131 / US | 09 /
ZENG, Wei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 10 /
ZHANG, Wenshu San Diego, California 92131 / US | 11 /
LI, Yinghui Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22732851.5 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022US72269 | Priority number, date | US202163187085P | 11.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163187085 P | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022241448 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320766 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/0072 (EP,KR);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,KR);
H04L1/0061 (US);
H04L1/0067 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1671 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0051 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0057 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0094 (EP,KR);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W72/232 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | MODULARISIERTER ENTWURF FÜR UCI-MULTIPLEXING MIT INTERPHYSIKALISCHER SCHICHTPRIORITÄT | [2024/07] | English: | MODULARIZED DESIGN FOR INTER-PHYSICAL LAYER PRIORITY UCI MULTIPLEXING | [2024/07] | French: | CONCEPTION MODULAIRE POUR LE MULTIPLEXAGE UCI DE PRIORITÉ DE COUCHE INTER-PHYSIQUE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2020202068 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [XAI]US2021051649 (HE HONG [US], et al); |