EP4356574 - TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR AND METHOD OF TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SYMBOLS OVER AN ORTHOGONAL TIME FREQUENCY SPACE COMMUNICATION CHANNEL SUBJECT TO DOPPLER SPREAD AND MULTIPATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Nanyang Technological University 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yujie Singapur 639798 / SG | 02 /
GUAN, Yong Liang Singapur 639798 / SG | 03 /
GONZÁLEZ GONZÁLEZ, David 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Lindemann, Robert Abeggstraße 45 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22732904.2 | 24.05.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022EP64001 | Priority number, date | DE202110205468 | 28.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021205468 | DE202110126321 | 11.10.2021 Original published format: DE102021126321 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022248446 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356574 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H04L27/2639 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0222 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2605 (KR);
H04L27/2613 (EP);
H04L27/26134 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2628 (KR);
H04W52/325 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | SENDER UND EMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SYMBOLEN ÜBER EINEN ORTHOGONALEN ZEITFREQUENZRAUMKOMMUNIKATIONSKANAL MIT DOPPLERSPREIZUNG UND MEHRWEGEAUSBREITUNG | [2024/17] | English: | TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR AND METHOD OF TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SYMBOLS OVER AN ORTHOGONAL TIME FREQUENCY SPACE COMMUNICATION CHANNEL SUBJECT TO DOPPLER SPREAD AND MULTIPATH | [2024/17] | French: | ÉMETTEUR ET RÉCEPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SYMBOLES SUR UN CANAL DE COMMUNICATION D'ESPACE TEMPS-FRÉQUENCE ORTHOGONAL (OFTS) SOUMIS À UN ÉTALEMENT DOPPLER ET À VOIES MULTIPLES | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 19.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2021001278 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); |