EP4355189 - MICROPLASTIC FILTER FOR WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengst SE Nienkamp 55-85 48147 Münster / DE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Andreas 48147 Münster / DE | 02 /
TILLMANNS, Henning 48157 Münster / DE | 03 /
WEGMANN, Marcus 48346 Ostbevern / DE | 04 /
MATHY, Gunter 48151 Münster / DE | 05 /
LÜERSMANN, Markus 48159 Münster / DE | 06 /
KLAVER, Tom 51065 Köln / DE | 07 /
HEITJANS, Martin 48432 Rheine / DE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22733565.0 | 08.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022EP65523 | Priority number, date | DE202110115442 | 15.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021115442 | [2024/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022263250 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4355189 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, B01D29/35, B01D29/58, B01D29/64, B01D29/82, B01D25/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B01D29/35 (EP,US);
D06F39/10 (EP,US);
B01D25/001 (EP);
B01D29/54 (US);
B01D29/58 (EP,US);
B01D29/6415 (EP,US);
B01D29/824 (EP,US);
B01D35/153 (US);
B01D35/30 (US);
C02F1/001 (US);
D06F39/085 (US);
B01D2201/301 (US);
B01D2201/325 (US);
C02F2101/30 (US);
C02F2103/002 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | MICROPLASTIKFILTER FÜR WASCHMASCHINE | [2024/17] | English: | MICROPLASTIC FILTER FOR WASHING MACHINE | [2024/17] | French: | FILTRE À MICROPLASTIQUE POUR LAVE-LINGE | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 11.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2004064978 (LOBBAN SARAH ELIZABETH CHENERY [AU], et al); | [X]DE102017001968 (HYDAC PROCESS TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP3412195 (NEOPERL GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2576859 (INHERITING EARTH LTD [GB]); | [X]US2020248837 (HART DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]EP3816336 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]WO2021086277 (FTS FILTRASYON ARITIM SISTEMLERI SAN TIC A S [TR]) | by applicant | US2009071912 | DE102016004326 | DE202019003578U |