EP4352855 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAAK, Johannes Wilhelmus 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ETTES, Wilhelmus Gerardus Maria 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
LEBENS, Pascal Leonard Maria Theodoor 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LULOFS, Klaas Jakob 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22734119.5 | 30.05.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP64509 | Priority number, date | EP20210178185 | 08.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21178185 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022258403 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352855 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/80, H02J50/12 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H02J50/80 (EP,KR);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR);
H02J50/90 (KR);
H04B5/26 (KR);
H04B5/79 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2024/16] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER | [2024/16] | French: | TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 08.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014015478 (VON NOVAK WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]WO2016195514 (POWERBYPROXI LTD [NZ]); | [A]US2018323647 (VAN WAGENINGEN ANDRIES [NL], et al); | [A]US2018323648 (JOYE NEIL FRANCIS [NL], et al); | [A]WO2021048019 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) | by applicant | US2018323647 | US2018323648 | WO2021048019 |