EP4348414 - COMPUTATIONAL NETWORK ENCODING FOR FULLY HOMOMORPHIC EVALUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zama SAS 8 Rue du Sentier 75002 Paris / FR | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALLIER-MAMES, Benoit 75002 Paris / FR | 02 /
PAILLIER, Pascal Gilbert Yves 75018 Paris / FR | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | DeltaPatents B.V. Fellenoord 370 5611 ZL Eindhoven / NL | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22734227.6 | 03.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022EP65197 | Priority number, date | EP20210290038 | 04.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21290038 | EP20210197777 | 20.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21197777 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022254011 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4348414 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/544, H04L9/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06F7/544 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/008 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/3093 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F2207/4824 (EP,IL,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | RECHNERISCHE NETZWERKCODIERUNG ZUR VOLLSTÄNDIG HOMOMORPHEN BEURTEILUNG | [2024/15] | English: | COMPUTATIONAL NETWORK ENCODING FOR FULLY HOMOMORPHIC EVALUATION | [2024/15] | French: | CODAGE DE RÉSEAU DE CALCUL POUR UNE ÉVALUATION ENTIÈREMENT HOMOMORPHE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |