EP4373719 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE UNIT WITH AN EMERGENCY RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22734604.6 | 22.06.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022EP66997 | Priority number, date | DE202110118896 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021118896 | [2024/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023001472 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373719 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/66, B60T13/68, B60T17/22 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/385 (EP,US);
B60T13/683 (EP,US);
B60T15/041 (US);
B60T17/22 (EP);
B60T2201/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHE FESTSTELLBREMSEINHEIT MIT NOTLÖSUNG | [2024/22] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE UNIT WITH AN EMERGENCY RELEASE | [2024/22] | French: | UNITÉ FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE COMPORTANT UNE LIBÉRATION D'URGENCE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 06.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE102018117596 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,23,28 * paragraphs [0057] , [0066] - [0071]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,8-22,27 [I] 24-26; | [A]DE102019131110 (WABCO EUROPE BVBA [BE]) [A] 1-28* paragraph [0060]; figure - * | by applicant | DE102017005757 | WO2019030242 | DE102018108202 |