EP4356335 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE TO BROWSE A COLLECTION OF IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zhihong Beijing, Chaoyang District 100013 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Liang Beijing, Dongcheng District 100013 / CN | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22735589.8 | 09.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022IB00321 | Priority number, date | WO2021CN99919 | 14.06.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/099919 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022263924 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356335 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06V20/30, G06V40/16 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G06V40/172 (EP,US);
G06V20/30 (EP,US);
G06V40/168 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHSUCHEN EINER SAMMLUNG VON BILDERN | [2024/17] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE TO BROWSE A COLLECTION OF IMAGES | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR EXPLORER UNE COLLECTION D'IMAGES | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007011709 (YOUFINDER INTELLECTUAL PROPERT [HU], et al); | [X]WO2010006367 (IMPREZZEO PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]US8531478 (LEE CHI-MING [TW], et al) |