EP4308287 - POLYAMIDE-BASED MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACQUEMOND, Marlene 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
NICOLAE, Anaick 1242 Satigny / CH | 03 /
OUALI, Lahoussine 1242 Satigny / CH | 04 /
ETCHENAUSIA, Laura 1242 Satigny / CH | 05 /
VALMACCO, Valentina 1242 Satigny / CH | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22735859.5 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022EP66895 | Priority number, date | EP20210182003 | 28.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21182003 | EP20210200682 | 04.10.2021 Original published format: EP 21200682 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274788 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308287 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/16, A01N25/28, A23L27/00, A23P10/30, A61K8/11, A61K9/48, B01J13/22, C11D3/50, F28D20/02, A01P1/00, A01P3/00, A01P7/02, A01P9/00, A01P11/00, A01P13/00, A01P17/00, A01P19/00, A61K8/88, A61Q5/02, A61Q13/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (EP);
A01N31/14 (EP);
A01N35/02 (EP);
A01N37/02 (EP);
A01N37/34 (EP);
A01N37/40 (EP);
A01N43/08 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
A01P1/00 (EP);
A01P3/00 (EP);
A01P7/00 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/732 (EP);
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61K8/88 (EP);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
B01J13/22 (EP);
C08G69/04 (US);
C08G69/10 (US);
C08L89/005 (US);
C11D3/50 (EP);
C11D3/505 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/28, A01N31/14, A01N35/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/34, A01N37/40, A01N43/08, A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N31/14, A01N37/40, A01N43/08 (EP);
A01N35/02, A01N31/14, A01N35/02, A01N37/34, A01N37/40, A01N43/08 (EP);
A01N37/02, A01N31/14, A01N35/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/34, A01N37/40, A01N43/08, A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N37/34, A01N31/14, A01N37/40, A01N43/08 (EP);
A01N37/40, A01N37/40 (EP);
A01N43/08, A01N37/40 (EP);
A01N43/90, A01N31/14, A01N35/02, A01N37/34, A01N37/40, A01N43/08 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | MIKROKAPSELN AUF POLYAMIDBASIS | [2024/04] | English: | POLYAMIDE-BASED MICROCAPSULES | [2024/04] | French: | MICROCAPSULES À BASE DE POLYAMIDE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020129947 (OUALI LAHOUSSINE [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2020127749 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [XI]WO2021023647 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [XAI]US2021138423 (PARK NOJIN [KR], et al) | by applicant | EP0025799 | WO2007004166 | EP2300146 | WO2012007438 | WO2013026657 | WO2017134179 | WO2018115250 | WO2021185724 |