EP4359393 - PROCESS FOR MAKING EPOXIDE DERIVATIVES OF FARNESENE AND USE THEREOF IN FURTHER SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSIANI, Giacomo 4057 Basel / CH | 02 /
BAUMGARTNER, Corinne 8340 Hinwil / CH | 03 /
GRANIER, Thierry 8600 Duebendorf / CH | 04 /
LOVCHIK, Martin 8600 Duebendorf / CH | 05 /
SCHROEDER, Fridtjof 8442 Hettlingen / CH | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan SA Grafenaustrasse 7 6300 Zug / CH | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22735869.4 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022EP66928 | Priority number, date | GB20210008985 | 23.06.2021 Original published format: GB 202108985 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268840 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359393 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/03, C07C51/367, C07C59/90, C07D301/32, C07D303/04 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
C07D301/03 (EP,IL);
C07C33/02 (EP,IL,US);
C07D303/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07C45/39 (EP,IL);
C07C45/676 (EP,IL);
C07C67/343 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/39, C07C49/24 (EP);
C07C45/676, C07C49/24 (EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/732 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EPOXIDDERIVATEN DES FARNESENS UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI DER WEITEREN SYNTHESE | [2024/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING EPOXIDE DERIVATIVES OF FARNESENE AND USE THEREOF IN FURTHER SYNTHESIS | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DÉRIVÉS ÉPOXYDES DE FARNÉSÈNE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UNE SYNTHÈSE ULTÉRIEURE | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2006099313 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2021209482 | WO2021EP59618 |