EP4275179 - VOLUMETRIC VIDEO FROM AN IMAGE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOOM.COM LTD. 2 Shoham Street 5251003 Ramat Gan / IL | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGARLITSKY, Vsevolod 5229515 Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
KEINAN, Shirley 6940085 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
GREEN, Amir 1529500 Mitzpe Netofa / IL | 04 /
BARUCH, Yair 1529500 Tel Aviv / IL | 05 /
LEV, Roi Brooklyn, New York, NY 11249 / US | 06 /
BIRNBOIM, Michael 1529500 Holon / IL | 07 /
TAMIR, Michael 6965100 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22736720.8 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022IL50046 | Priority number, date | US202163135765P | 11.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163135765 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022149148 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275179 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T15/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T15/205 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06T15/04 (EP,US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T7/194 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | VOLUMETRISCHES VIDEO AUS EINER BILDQUELLE | [2023/46] | English: | VOLUMETRIC VIDEO FROM AN IMAGE SOURCE | [2023/46] | French: | VIDÉO VOLUMÉTRIQUE PROVENANT D'UNE SOURCE D'IMAGE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2018068414 (SAVVIDES MARIOS [US], et al); | [XY]US2019035165 (GAUSEBECK DAVID ALAN [US]); | [Y]US2019080483 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al); | [XY]US2020306640 (KOLEN JOHN [US], et al); |