EP4275511 - BEVERAGE CONTAINING GALACTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Koji Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 02 /
YASUI, Yohei Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22736760.4 | 06.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022JP00189 | Priority number, date | JP20210002193 | 08.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021002193 | [2023/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022149592 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275511 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/00, A23L2/52, A23L2/56 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L2/56 (EP);
A23L27/84 (EP);
A23L27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | GALACTOOLIGOSACCHARID ENTHALTENDES GETRÄNK | [2023/46] | English: | BEVERAGE CONTAINING GALACTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDE | [2023/46] | French: | BOISSON CONTENANT DES GALACTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | Translation filed | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2003250486 (AMANO ENZYME INC, et al) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, paragraph [0011], examples *; | [Y]JP2010119348 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, paragraph [0031], examples *; | [Y]JP2013153681 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, paragraph [0016], examples *; | [Y]JP2014060987 (ADEKA CORP) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, paragraph [0009], examples *; | [Y]JP2016127818 (SUNTORY BEVERAGE & FOOD LTD) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, paragraphs [0013], [0023], [0024], examples *; | [Y]WO2019049976 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, examples *; | [Y]WO2019049978 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, examples *; | [Y]WO2019059390 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, examples *; | [Y]WO2019059391 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 2 * claims, examples *; | [PX]JP6919081B (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD.) [PX] 1, 2* claims, examples * | by applicant | JP2016127818 |