EP4277434 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING COMPLETION MESSAGE RELATING TO SL DRX CONFIGURATION IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Jongwoo Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
BACK, Seoyoung Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Giwon Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22736909.7 | 10.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022KR00379 | Priority number, date | KR20210003483 | 11.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210003483 | KR20210063551 | 17.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210063551 | KR20210099354 | 28.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210099354 | US202163229479P | 04.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163229479 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022149932 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277434 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04W76/14, H04W72/04, H04W92/18, H04W92/10, H04W72/02, H04W72/12 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/25 (EP,KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,KR);
H04W92/10 (KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN EINER ABSCHLUSSNACHRICHT IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SL-DRX-KONFIGURATION IN NR V2X | [2023/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING COMPLETION MESSAGE RELATING TO SL DRX CONFIGURATION IN NR V2X | [2023/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION DE MESSAGE D'ACHÈVEMENT RELATIF À UNE CONFIGURATION DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE (DRX) DE LIAISON LATÉRALE (SL) DANS NR V2X | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2023 | Translation filed | 31.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015201375 (VANNITHAMBY RATH [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0045]-[0049]. *; | [Y]KR20150100205 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,17-20 * See paragraphs [0092]-[0097]; and figure 12. *; | [Y] - Intel Corporation, "Alignment of DRX wake up times", 3GPP Draft; R2-2008988, (20201023), vol. RAN WG2, pages 1 - 6, XP051942036 [Y] 1-5,9-10,14-16 * See sections 2.1-2.2. * | [Y] - LG Electronics, "Discussion on physical layer design considering sidelink DRX operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-2007897, (20201024), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 15, XP051946545 [Y] 1-5,9-10,14-16 * See section 2.1. * | [Y] - LG Electronics, "Discussion on feasibility and benefits for mode 2 enhancement", 3GPP Draft; R1-2007896, (20201024), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 26, XP051946544 [Y] 2-3,5,17-20 * See section 2.1. * |