EP4274559 - MODULATORS OF PROGRAMMED DEATH-LIGAND-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Research Institute 2000 9th Avenue South Birmingham, Alabama 35205 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTO, Mark, J. Homewood, AL 35209 / US | 02 /
MATHEW, Bini Hoover, AL 35226 / US | 03 /
BOOHAKER, Rebecca Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22737000.4 | 04.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022US11200 | Priority number, date | US202163134170P | 05.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163134170 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022150314 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274559 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, C07C233/65, A61P35/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D417/12 (US);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/4468 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07C233/81 (US);
C07C233/83 (US);
C07C237/36 (EP);
C07C237/38 (EP);
C07D211/66 (US);
C07D277/64 (US);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4468, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | MODULATOREN DES LIGANDEN-1 FÜR PROGRAMMIERTEN ZELLTOD | [2023/46] | English: | MODULATORS OF PROGRAMMED DEATH-LIGAND-1 | [2023/46] | French: | MODULATEURS DE MORT PROGRAMMÉE-LIGAND-1 | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 21.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9822494 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 34-38, 69-78 * pg 1, In 21-25; pg 40, pg 43, table *; | [A]US2019127420 (SUTO MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 34-38, 69-78 * para [0203], [0444] *; | [A]US2020361871 (COLLINGWOOD STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3, 34-38, 69-78* para [0047]-[0048], [1285] *; | [A] - Anonymous , "SID 367702775 ", Pubchem substance, Database accession no. 367702775, URL: NCBI, XP055956517 [A] 1-3, 34-38, 69-78 * ; pg 2 * |