EP4272386 - TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR HIGH-RESOLUTION SUB-BAND CODED TIME-FREQUENCY WAVEFORM RADAR SYSTEM WITH BANDPASS SAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aura Intelligent Systems, Inc. 12 Channel Street, Suite 202 Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Inseop Pittstown, New Jersey 08867 / US | 02 /
LEE, Jungah Boston, Massachusetts 02128 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22737309.9 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/45] | WO2022US12036 | Priority number, date | US202163135916P | 11.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163135916 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022150783 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272386 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00, H04L27/26, H04L5/00, H04J13/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0012 (EP,KR);
G01S13/284 (EP,KR);
G01S13/42 (EP,KR);
G01S7/0232 (EP,KR);
G01S7/0234 (EP,KR);
H04B1/713 (EP,KR);
H04J13/0059 (EP,KR);
H04L27/2602 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SENDER UND EMPFÄNGER FÜR HOCHAUFLÖSENDES SUBBANDKODIERTES ZEIT-FREQUENZ-WELLENFORMRADARSYSTEM MIT BANDPASSABTASTUNG | [2023/45] | English: | TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR HIGH-RESOLUTION SUB-BAND CODED TIME-FREQUENCY WAVEFORM RADAR SYSTEM WITH BANDPASS SAMPLING | [2023/45] | French: | ÉMETTEUR ET RÉCEPTEUR POUR SYSTÈME RADAR À FORME D'ONDE À TEMPS-FRÉQUENCE CODÉ À SOUS-BANDE HAUTE RÉSOLUTION AVEC ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE BANDE PASSANTE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004213351 (SHATTIL STEVE J [US]) [Y] 6-8, 14-16 * ; entire document, para [0358], [0396], [0405], [0434], [0439] *; | [A]US2014266843 (PAGNANELLI CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-16* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2018324102 (TAKAHASHI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-8, 14-16 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG. 12, 18, para [0005], [0179],[0179], [0207], [0208], [0215], [0216] *; | [Y]US2019053013 (MARKHOVSKY FELIX [US], et al) [Y] 8, 16 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, para [0108], [0328], [0372], [0373], [0566] *; | [A]US2020092146 (NAZARATHY MOSHE [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * ; entire document *; | [XY]WO2020150283 (AURA INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5, 9-13 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG.1,2, 9, 11, 12, 13, para [0036], [0037]. [0038], [0070],[0071], [0083], [0085], [0093], [0105], [0107], [0115]-[0118] * [Y] 6-8, 14-16 |