EP4363981 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECONFIGURING A SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAIN, Tobias 3281 Oberndorf/Melk / AT | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Jan David 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
VARGHESE, Serin 38126 Braunschweig / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22737569.8 | 16.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022EP66488 | Priority number, date | DE202110206943 | 01.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021206943 | [2024/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274745 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363981 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30, G06F9/445, G06N3/02 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06F11/3013 (EP);
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06F9/5066 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REKONFIGURIEREN EINER SYSTEMARCHITEKTUR EINES AUTOMATISIERT FAHRENDEN FAHRZEUGS | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECONFIGURING A SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONFIGURATION D'UNE ARCHITECTURE DE SYSTÈME D'UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2021133057 (HAYES JOHN [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0064] * * figures 1-9 * * claims 1-20 *; | [I]US2021188314 (KAIN TOBIAS [AT], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0075] * * figures 1-8 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2021188294 (KAIN TOBIAS [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0068] ** figures 1-7 * | by applicant | - TOBIAS KAIN et al., "Towards a Reliable and Context-Based System Architecture for Autonomous Vehicles", 2nd International Workshop on Autonomous Systems Design (ASD 2020, (20200000), pages 1 - 7 |