EP4366593 - VACUUM TOILET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRAINVAC GMBH Hafenstrasse 32 22880 Wedel / DE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OREMEK, Peter 22880 Wedel / DE | 02 /
SCHEIBA, Daniel 22880 Wedel / DE | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22738666.1 | 05.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022EP68493 | Priority number, date | DE202120103619U | 05.07.2021 Original published format: DE 202021103619 U | [2024/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280795 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366593 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/12, A47K13/24, B60R15/04, E05D11/10 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A47K13/245 (EP);
A47K13/12 (EP);
B60R15/04 (EP);
E05D11/1014 (EP);
E05Y2201/474 (EP);
E05Y2201/638 (EP);
E05Y2999/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | VAKUUMTOILETTE | [2024/20] | English: | VACUUM TOILET | [2024/20] | French: | TOILETTE À ASPIRATION | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 05.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102012018623 (DOWALDWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]EP3622868 (EVAC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 13] , [0116]; figures 1,5,7a-7b * [I] 3,6; | [A]DE202020106646U (TRAINVAC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6* paragraphs [0002] , [0 18] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | EP2233052 |