EP4366994 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC VALVE ASSEMBLY WITH SELF-LOCKING SAFETY VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOSTERMANN, Thilo 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | 02 /
OTREMBA, Robert 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | 03 /
VAN THIEL, Julian 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22738674.5 | 05.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022EP68603 | Priority number, date | DE202110117210 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021117210 | [2024/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280864 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366994 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68, B60T13/04, B60T17/22 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B60T13/683 (EP,US);
B60T13/261 (EP);
B60T13/385 (US);
B60T17/083 (US);
B60T17/22 (EP);
B60T8/3605 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHE VENTILANORDNUNG MIT SELBSTHALTENDEM SICHERHEITSVENTIL | [2024/20] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC VALVE ASSEMBLY WITH SELF-LOCKING SAFETY VALVE | [2024/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE DOTÉ D'UNE SOUPAPE DE SÉCURITÉ À VERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 06.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE102017007781 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] *[A] 1; | [XYI]DE102019125747 (WABCO EUROPE BVBA [BE]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9-11,13-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0032] , [0040] , [0042] * [Y] 5,8 [I] 2,3,12; | [YA]DE102019130762 (WABCO EUROPE BVBA [BE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] , [0051] , [0052] * [A] 1 |