EP4355132 - A COMPONENT FOR USE IN A NON-COMBUSTIBLE AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Benjamin London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
HODGSON, Matthew London WC2R 3LA / GB | 03 /
DIMMICK, Barry London WC2R 3LA / GB | 04 /
HEPWORTH, Richard London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Philip Mark, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22738711.5 | 17.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022GB51560 | Priority number, date | GB20210008825 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: GB 202108825 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022263865 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355132 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24B15/16 (KR);
A24C5/24 (KR);
A24D1/02 (KR,US);
A24D1/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | KOMPONENTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM NICHTBRENNBAREN AEROSOLBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | A COMPONENT FOR USE IN A NON-COMBUSTIBLE AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | COMPOSANT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'AÉROSOL NON COMBUSTIBLE | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]WO2018162515 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [XAYI]WO2020025737 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]); | [XAYI]WO2020181358 (SELBY RYAN DANIEL [CA], et al) | by applicant | WO2020148538 |