EP4366646 - CO-MANIPULATION SURGICAL SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL SCANNERS FOR USE WITH SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS FOR PERFORMING LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moon Surgical SAS 9 rue d'Enghien 75010 Paris / FR | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ, Jeffery Byron San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
LINARD, Nicolas 92120 Montrouge / FR | 03 /
BASAFA, Ehsan Redwood City, California 94065 / US | 04 /
UMMALANENI, Ritwik San Francisco, California 94109 / US | 05 /
FAYAD, Jad 75007 Paris / FR | 06 /
NOONAN, David Paul San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 07 /
WU, Victoria Cheng-Tan San Francisco, California 94102 / US | 08 /
MAGO, Jesus 94160 Saint-Mande / FR | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22738744.6 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022IB56159 | Priority number, date | EP20210305929 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21305929 | EP20210306904 | 22.12.2021 Original published format: EP 21306904 | EP20210306905 | 22.12.2021 Original published format: EP 21306905 | WO2022IB52989 | 30.03.2022 Original published format: PCT/IB2022/052989 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2023281372 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4366646 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, G06T7/50, G06T7/70, A61B34/20, A61B34/00, A61B17/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP);
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B34/25 (EP);
A61B2017/00207 (EP);
A61B2034/2055 (EP);
A61B2034/2065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM MIT COMANIPULATION MIT OPTISCHEN SCANNERN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG LAPAROSKOPISCHER CHIRURGIE | [2024/20] | English: | CO-MANIPULATION SURGICAL SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL SCANNERS FOR USE WITH SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS FOR PERFORMING LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY | [2024/20] | French: | SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL DE CO-MANIPULATION AYANT DES SCANNERS OPTIQUES À UTILISER AVEC DES INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX POUR EFFECTUER UNE CHIRURGIE LAPAROSCOPIQUE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016361125 (BALICKI MARCIN ARKADIUSZ [US], et al) [A] 31-45* paragraph [0027]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2019199915 (COISEUR FLORIAN [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,22 * figures 2,4,5 *; | [X]US2019254757 (PIRON CAMERON ANTHONY [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,22 * paragraphs [0066] , [0093]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [XY]US2020279394 (HONG DEOK HWA [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,22 * paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [A]US2020305984 (ZHAO TAO [US], et al) [A] 4 * figures 8-11 *; | [A]KR102188334B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8,9,22 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US11007031 (FUERST BERNHARD ADOLF [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,22 * columns 1,5,6,7; figures 1-3, 6-9 * [Y] 4 [I] 9,23; | [A]US11007020 (ZIRAKNEJAD NIMA [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8,9,22 * figures 1-3 *; | [AP]US2022032473 (MARET ALEXANDER JOHN [US]) [AP] 31-45 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 69]; figure 8 * | by applicant | US10118289 | US10582977 |