EP4279987 - ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangyi Intelligent Tech (Suzhou) Co., Ltd 122 Yong'an Road, High-tech Zone Suzhou, Jiangsu 215151 / CN | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Chenbi Suzhou, Jiangsu 215151 / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22738951.7 | 10.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022CN70945 | Priority number, date | CN20211042216 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110042216 | [2023/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022152070 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279987 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/155, G02F1/153, G02F1/163 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G02F1/155 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/153 (CN);
G02F1/163 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHROME VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/47] | English: | ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SAME | [2023/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHROMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2023 | Translation filed | 01.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN108490712 (ANHUI XINHAO PLASMA DISPLAY DEVICES CO LTD) [Y] 5-10 * description paragraphs [0005]-[0054], figures 3, 4 *; | [XY]CN109597260 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * description paragraphs [0034]-[0122], figures 1-5C * [Y] 5-10; | [X]JP2019158940 (KANEKA CORP) [X] 1-4 * description, paragraphs [0007]-[0049], and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN111897172 (SHENZHEN GUANGYI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [PX]CN112782899 (SHENZHEN GUANGYI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0064], and figures 1-10 *; | [PX]CN214375727U (GUANGYI INTELLIGENT TECH SUZHOU CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0045], and figures 1-9 * | by applicant | CN20211042216 |