EP4280729 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING BURST TRANSMISSION IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Woosuk Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Hanbyul Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
HWANG, Daesung Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739621.5 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022KR00451 | Priority number, date | US202163137058P | 13.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163137058 P | US202163137074P | 13.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163137074 P | US202163137073P | 13.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163137073 P | KR20210007457 | 19.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210007457 | US202163142966P | 28.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163142966 P | US202163142978P | 28.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163142978 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154426 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280729 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/12, H04W72/10, H04W72/08, H04W72/04, H04W76/28, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04B17/328 (KR);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W72/25 (EP,KR);
H04W72/542 (EP);
H04W74/0808 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER BURST-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN NR V2X | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING BURST TRANSMISSION IN NR V2X | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉALISATION DE TRANSMISSION EN RAFALE DANS NR V2X | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2023 | Translation filed | 19.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020029340 (HE CHAO [US], et al); |