EP4258769 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALLOCATING SIDELINK RESOURCES ON BASIS OF INTER-UE COORDINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 12, Heolleung-ro, Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Wonkwang University Center for Industry - Academy Cooperation 460, Iksan-daero Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54538 / KR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Gene Back Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18280 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Ui Hyun Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18280 / KR | 03 /
SON, Hyuk Min Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54653 / KR | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 22739680.1 | 12.01.2022 | [2023/41] | WO2022KR00573 | Priority number, date | KR20210004819 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210004819 | [2023/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154485 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258769 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/08, H04W92/18 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H04W72/40 (EP);
H04W72/02 (KR);
H04W72/1263 (KR);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W72/51 (KR);
H04W72/25 (EP);
H04W74/0808 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON SIDELINK-RESSOURCEN AUF BASIS VON INTER-UE-KOORDINATION | [2023/41] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALLOCATING SIDELINK RESOURCES ON BASIS OF INTER-UE COORDINATION | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES DE LIAISON LATÉRALE SUR LA BASE D'UNE COORDINATION INTER-UE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2023 | Translation filed | 05.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20170080609 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 2,5-6,9-13,15-20 * See paragraphs [0347]-[0421]; claims 1 and 5; and figure 15. *; | [A]KR20190003774 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0151]-[0155]; and figure 8. *; | [Y]WO2020022781 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4-5,16-17 * See paragraph [0387]; and figure 27. *; | [XYA]WO2020060276 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3 * See paragraphs [0184]-[0193]; and figure 17. * [Y] 2,4-6,9-13,15-20 [A] 7-8,14; | [A]KR20200086920 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0070]-[0357]; and figures 6a-11d. * |