EP4280394 - PLUG CONNECTOR COUPLED TO RECEPTACLE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENSORVIEW CO., LTD. 705-1ho, 705ho, A dong, 240, Pangyoyeok-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13493 / KR | For all designated states Okins Electronics Co., Ltd. 6th floor, 13, Ojeongongeop-gil Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do 16072 / KR | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Byoung Nam Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14549 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Kyoung Il Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16694 / KR | 03 /
LIM, Jong Hyup Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18487 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Jae Kun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16671 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Dong Uk Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16636 / KR | 06 /
JUN, Jin Kook Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 15823 / KR | 07 /
PARK, Sung Gyu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14106 / KR | 08 /
HAM, Jong Wook Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 15874 / KR | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739762.7 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022KR00724 | Priority number, date | KR20210006556 | 18.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210006556 | [2023/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154570 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280394 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6581, H01R13/652 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H01R4/023 (EP);
H01R13/6581 (KR);
H01R24/44 (US);
H01R13/652 (KR);
H01R13/6593 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | MIT EINEM BUCHSENVERBINDER GEKOPPELTER STECKVERBINDER | [2023/47] | English: | PLUG CONNECTOR COUPLED TO RECEPTACLE CONNECTOR | [2023/47] | French: | CONNECTEUR MÂLE ACCOUPLÉ À UN CONNECTEUR FEMELLE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2023 | Translation filed | 28.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP3134082B ; | [A]KR200308178Y ; | [A]US2012322304 (TAGUCHI HIROYUKI [JP]); | [YA]JP6390862B ; | [A]JP2019003771 (DAIICHI SEIKO CO LTD) |