EP4280268 - SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Tae Sup Seoul 07796 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Woon Seoul 07796 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Jin Ho Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739840.1 | 18.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022KR00942 | Priority number, date | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210006590 | [2023/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154648 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280268 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/29, H01L23/00, H01L23/492, H01L23/50 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (KR,US);
H01L24/81 (US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/492 (KR);
H01L23/50 (KR);
H01L24/10 (KR);
H01L24/26 (KR);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
H01L24/73 (US);
H01L24/83 (KR,US);
H01L24/92 (US);
H01L2224/1131 (US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (US);
H01L2224/2731 (US);
H01L2224/29015 (US);
H01L2224/2919 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81192 (US);
H01L2224/8121 (US);
H01L2224/81395 (US);
H01L2224/81447 (US);
H01L2224/8149 (US);
H01L2224/81815 (US);
H01L2224/81862 (US);
H01L2224/81906 (US);
H01L2224/83102 (US);
H01L2224/83191 (US);
H01L2224/8321 (US);
H01L2224/83862 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERGEHÄUSE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/47] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/47] | French: | BOÎTIER DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | Translation filed | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR100536978B ; | [Y]KR100823699B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120065595 (KWON OH TAE [KR]); | [Y]KR20140102597 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2018029176 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) |