Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024234364 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A9 | US2024136322 | 25.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR00942 | 18.01.2022 | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024502563 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR00942 | 18.01.2022 | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116711066 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR00942 | 18.01.2022 | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4280268 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR00942 | 18.01.2022 | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022154648 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220104388 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210006590 | 18.01.2021 |