EP4278024 - COMPOSITE THERMAL SPRAY POWDER OF OXIDES AND NON-OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Metco (US) Inc. 1101 Prospect Avenue Westbury, NY 11590 / US | [2024/03] |
Former [2023/47] | For all designated states Oerlikon Metco (US) Inc. 1101 Prospect Ave. Westbury NY 11590 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Scott 8050 Zürich / CH | 02 /
SZYNDELMAN, Gregory 5234 Villigen / CH | 03 /
BARTH, Alexander 78467 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
LEE, Hwasoo New York, NY 11801 / US | [2024/03] |
Former [2023/47] | 01 /
WILSON, Scott 8050 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
SZYNDELMAN, Gregory 5234 Villigen / CH | |||
03 /
BARTH, Alexander 78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
04 /
LEE, Hwasoo New York 11801 / US | Representative(s) | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Am Stein 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739936.7 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US11982 | Priority number, date | US202163136413P | 12.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163136413 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022155134 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278024 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/11, C23C4/126, C23C4/129, C23C4/134, F01D5/28, F01D11/12 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
C09D5/031 (US);
C09D1/00 (US);
C23C4/129 (EP);
C23C4/134 (EP);
C23C4/18 (EP);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F01D11/12 (EP,US);
F05D2260/95 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTES THERMISCHES SPRÜHPULVER AUS OXIDEN UND NICHTOXIDEN | [2023/47] | English: | COMPOSITE THERMAL SPRAY POWDER OF OXIDES AND NON-OXIDES | [2023/47] | French: | POUDRE DE PULVÉRISATION THERMIQUE COMPOSITE D'OXYDES ET DE NON-OXYDES | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011086163 (MA XINQING [US]); | [XY]US2012295825 (DORFMAN MITCHELL R [US], et al); | [X]US2017260101 (TORIGOE TAIJI [JP], et al); | [XY]US2019093497 (NDAMKA NGUNJOH LAWRENCE [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2020142125 (OERLIKON METCO US INC [US]); | [A]CN112063952 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG); | [PX]US2021130243 (WILSON SCOTT [CH]) |