EP4278092 - DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR A DIAPHRAGM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPLIGEN CORPORATION 41 Seyon Street Building 1 Suite 100 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAVLIK, Rudolf Huntington Beach, California 92647 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739941.7 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US12011 | Priority number, date | US202163136483P | 12.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163136483 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022155143 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278092 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/02, F04B43/00, F04B45/04, A61M1/16, A61M1/00 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
F04B43/0054 (EP);
F04B53/20 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP);
B01D61/147 (EP);
F04B43/02 (US);
F04B43/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MEMBRANPUMPE | [2023/47] | English: | DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR A DIAPHRAGM PUMP | [2023/47] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR POMPE À MEMBRANE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYA]US4786240 (KOROLY MICHAEL V [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 5, 13-14 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-3; col 4 In 49-52; col 5 In 26-29; col 7 In 43-46 * [Y] 4/(1-2), 15 [A] 3, 4/(3), 18-20; | [A]US5011380 (KOVACS STEVEN G [US]) [A] 1-5, 13-15, 18-20* , entire document *; | [A]US2007040454 (FREUDENBERGER THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 18-20 * , entire document, especailly Fig 1, 3; para [0064] *; | [Y]US2013059371 (SHEVITZ JERRY [US]) [Y] 4 * , entire document, especially Fig 1a; para [0278] *; | [A]US2016051740 (WEGENER CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 13-15, 18-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]WO2019133489 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) [Y] 15 * , entire document, especially para [0010]; para [0021] * |