EP4278798 - NR POSITIONING MEASUREMENT ACCURACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Rui Beijing 11, 100085 / CN | 02 /
CHERVYAKOV, Andrey Nizhegorodsky, 603006 / RU | 03 /
BOLOTIN, Ilya Nizhny-Novgorod, 603089 / RU | 04 /
LI, Hua Arlington, Virginia 22209 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22740144.5 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US12506 | Priority number, date | US202163138073P | 15.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163138073 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022155465 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278798 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W64/00, G01S5/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
G01S1/0428 (EP);
G01S5/0244 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | NR-POSITIONIERUNGSMESSGENAUIGKEIT | [2023/47] | English: | NR POSITIONING MEASUREMENT ACCURACY | [2023/47] | French: | PRÉCISION DE MESURE DE POSITIONNEMENT NR | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018028941 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* pages 4-16; and figures 1-14 *; | [A] - Intel Corporation, "Further Discussion on NR PRS RSTD Requirements", 3GPP Draft; R4-2006556, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200515), vol. RAN WG4, no. Electronic Meeting; 20200525 - 20200605, XP051883633 [A] 1-20 * sections 4.1-5 * | [A] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Discussion on accuracy requirements for UE Rx-Tx time difference measurement", 3GPP Draft; R4-2015763, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20201023), vol. RAN WG4, no. Electronic Meeting; 20201102 - 20201113, XP051944728 [A] 1-20 * section 2 * | [A] - vivo, "Discussion on potential positioning enhancements", 3GPP Draft; R1-2007666, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20201017), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, XP051939828 [A] 1-20 * sections 1-7 * | [A] - Ericsson, "Potential positioning enhancements", 3GPP Draft; R1-2008765, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20201016), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, XP051939650 [A] 1-20 * sections 1-2.3.4 * |