EP4258115 - DATA ERROR CORRECTION CIRCUIT AND DATA TRANSMISSION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changxin Memory Technologies, Inc. No. 388, Xingye Avenue Airport Industrial Park Economic and Technological Development Area Hefei City, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Kangling Hefei City, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 22740274.0 | 20.04.2022 | [2023/41] | WO2022CN87984 | Priority number, date | CN202210173543 | 24.02.2022 Original published format: CN202210173543 | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023159736 | Date: | 31.08.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258115 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.08.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10, G11C29/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06F13/4004 (EP,US);
G11C29/42 (KR);
G06F11/0793 (US);
G06F11/0745 (US);
G06F11/1048 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/1006 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENFEHLERKORREKTURSCHALTUNG UND DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2023/41] | English: | DATA ERROR CORRECTION CIRCUIT AND DATA TRANSMISSION CIRCUIT | [2023/41] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR DE DONNÉES ET CIRCUIT DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | Translation filed | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 11.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5335234 (MATTESON KEITH D [US], et al); | [XY]US2012246507 (LUO XIAO [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5335234 (MATTESON KEITH D [US], et al); | [A]CN1155950 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]CN106297895 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN112992257 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |