EP4351564 - COMBINATION MCL-1 INHIBITORS WITH ANTI-CANCER AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEY, Thomas, F. Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
MATSON, Clinton, K. Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
VENKATARAMANI, Chandrasekar Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22740699.8 | 09.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022US32805 | Priority number, date | US202163209682P | 11.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163209682 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022261301 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351564 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, A61K31/522, A61K31/553, A61K31/7068, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/553 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (KR);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/52 (EP);
A61K31/522 (EP);
A61K31/7068 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/553, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON MCL-1-INHIBITOREN MIT ANTIKREBSMITTELN | [2024/16] | English: | COMBINATION MCL-1 INHIBITORS WITH ANTI-CANCER AGENTS | [2024/16] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE MCL-1 EN COMBINAISON AVEC DES AGENTS ANTICANCÉREUX | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 27.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2019173692 (AGENUS INC [US]); | [XD]WO2019222112 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | [XD]WO2021096860 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | [A]WO2021108254 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) | by applicant | WO03074566 | US2006193865 | US7238785 | WO2007095749 | WO2007147613 | US7405295 | WO2008104386 | WO2008104385 | WO2008131000 | WO2008130970 | US7517964 | WO2010049816 | WO2011068845 | US7999083 | US8084583 | WO2011161699 | WO2012168944 | WO2013017322 | US2013039861 | US8435539 | US8435529 | WO2013068946 | WO2013077458 | WO2013132317 | WO2013144704 | WO2014151634 | WO2014163684 | WO2015019284 | WO2015033299 | WO2015033303 | WO2015033301 | WO2015034820 | WO2015036927 | WO2015044900 | WO2015097123 | WO2015098099 | WO2015119944 | WO2015134605 | WO2015160641 | WO2015179615 | WO2016019232 | WO2016033486 | WO2016039749 | WO2016057624 | WO2016077518 | WO2016100608 | WO2016100285 | WO2016126460 | US9427464 | WO2016142886 | WO2016142852 | WO2016142835 | WO2016142833 | WO2016142894 | WO2016149351 | US2016296633 | US9492566 | WO2016201300 | WO2016207225 | WO2016207226 | WO2016207217 | WO2016207216 | WO2017002776 | US2017021017 | WO2017017624 | WO2017066227 | WO2017070089 | WO2017079669 | WO2017087777 | WO2017087678 | WO2017106634 | WO2017112730 | WO2017125224 | US2017209594 | WO2017147410 | US2017274093 | WO2017176608 | WO2017182625 | WO2017192961 | WO2017205464 | US9850312 | WO2017222976 | WO2018009505 | WO2018013789 | WO2018015526 | WO2018026971 | WO2018036438 | WO2018036428 | WO2018044783 | WO2018044963 | WO2018051255 | WO2018051254 | US2018110772 | WO2018073754 | WO2018078064 | WO2018085750 | WO2018119286 | WO2018119266 | WO2018119263 | WO2018119236 | WO2018119221 | WO2018118848 | US2018185351 | WO2018127575 | CN108440674 | US2018271992 | WO2018183418 | WO2018178226 | WO2018178227 | WO2018217227 | WO2018234433 | US2019048095 | WO2019036575 | WO2019035911 | WO2019035927 | WO2019035899 | WO2019046150 | US2019248917 | WO2019173181 | WO2019211721 | WO2019222112 | US10501555 | WO2020016662 | WO2020078875 | WO2020097577 | WO2020094670 | WO2020099470 | WO2020099542 | WO2020115183 | WO2020123994 | WO2020130125 | US10703733 | WO2020160157 | CN111534585 | WO2020236817 | WO2020240467 | WO2020249063 | WO2020254299 | WO2020257648 | WO2020263830 | WO2021021259 | CN112321715 | US2021069343 | US2021093730 | WO2021096860 | WO2022031876 | US20080124582 | EP20110783675 |